EP0715166 - Method and device for testing a reusable bottle for contamination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [1999/18] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Hertizentrum 6 CH-6303 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pirani, Peter Böschacherstrasse 60 CH-8624 Grüt / CH | 02 /
Wildmann, Daniel, Dr. Buchserstrasse 36 CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH | 03 /
Rosatzin, Martin, Dr. Gyrhaldenstrasse 21 CH-8953 Dietikon / CH | [1996/23] | Application number, filing date | 95115189.3 | 27.09.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | CH19940003578 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: CH 357894 | [1996/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715166 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/9018 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI, NL, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung einer Mehrwegflasche auf Verunreinigungen | [1996/23] | English: | Method and device for testing a reusable bottle for contamination | [1996/23] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour contrôler la contamination d'un bouteille à usage répété | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2258915 (HAJIME INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1,3,6,7,9 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 1; figures 4,5; claims 1-3,9 * [A] 2; | [Y]WO8800862 (COCA COLA CO [US]) [Y] 1,3,6,7,9 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 21, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]DE4200971 (KRIEG GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,9,10 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 19; claim -; table - *; | [A]EP0557814 (KRIEG GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * column 6, line 6 - line 24; figure 6 * |