|
31.07.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.06.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2001 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.03.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.03.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.06.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2000 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.06.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.11.1995 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |