EP0709748 - Developing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Atsushi 589-28, Yuzaki Kawanishi-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-03 / JP | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/18] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115366.7 | 28.09.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | JP19940267263 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: JP 26726394 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709748 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709748 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709748 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G15/34 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
G03G15/0805 (EP,US);
G03G15/0822 (EP,US);
G03G15/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/18] | Title | German: | Entwicklungsanordnung | [1996/18] | English: | Developing device | [1996/18] | French: | Dispositif de dévelopement | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5233392 (KITAMURA TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * column W * [A] 3,6,7 [Y] 5; | [DY]JPH03211064 ; | [A]DE3206780 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 5,17-22 * page 6, line 13 - line 30 *; | [A]GB2070981 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 8-13 * page 3, column R, line 98 - line 129; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS57108871 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911211), vol. 015, no. 489, Database accession no. (M - 1189), & JP03211064 A 19910913 (BROTHER IND LTD) [DY] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821007), vol. 006, no. 198, Database accession no. (P - 147), & JP57108871 A 19820707 (CANON INC) [A] 14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS5844457 | JPS58114974 | JPH03168767 | JPH01503221 | JPH03211064 |