EP0707194 - Flight path generating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Kreetslag 10 D-21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kricke, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Drosselweg 30 D-25421 Pinneberg / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Dirk Krähenbeerheide 10 D-21149 Hamburg / DE | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115835.1 | 07.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | DE19944436356 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436356 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707194 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707194 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G05D1/06, G01C5/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
G05D1/0646 (EP);
G01C21/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Flugweggenerierung | [1996/16] | English: | Flight path generating method | [1996/16] | French: | Méthode pour générer un trajectoire de vol | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/25] | FR | 15.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WEIMANN ET AL., "TERRAIN MASKING AND THREAT AVOIDANCE USING LAND MASS DATA", IEEE NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS, DAYTON, MAY 23 - 27, 1988, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19880523), VOL. 2 OF 4, no. 1988, pages 540 - 545, XP000013463 [X] 1 * page 543, column L, line 30 - page 544, column R, line 34; figures 6-9 * | [A] - MENON P K A ET AL, "OPTIMAL TRAJECTORY SYNTHESIS FOR TERRAIN-FOLLOWING FLIGHT", JOURNAL OF GUIDANCE AND CONTROL AND DYNAMICS, (19910701), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 807 - 813, XP000320760 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - CHENG V H L, "CONCEPT DEVELOPMENT OF AUTOMATIC GUIDANCE FOR ROTORCRAFT OBSTACLE AVOIDANCE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, (19900401), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 252 - 257, XP000170539 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/70.54741 | by applicant | DE2907549 | DE3604401 |