EP0706791 - Detergent composition containing N-alkylcarbanylalcohol sulfate salts and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayaba-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Takashi 7-18-302, Hirata 3-chome Ichikawa-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Mizushima, Hiromoto 1-113, Kimiidera Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | 03 /
Yahagi, Kazuyuki 2-6-601, Tachibana 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95115971.4 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | JP19940245178 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: JP 24517894 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706791 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50, C11D1/12 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP);
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
C11D1/12 (EP);
C11D3/0089 (EP);
A61K2800/75 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/16] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel enthaltend ein N-Alkylcarbamylsulfatsalz sowie ihre Verwendung | [1996/16] | English: | Detergent composition containing N-alkylcarbanylalcohol sulfate salts and use thereof | [1996/16] | French: | Composition détergente contenant une sulfate de N-alkylcarbamylalcool sel, et son utilisation | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/30] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0621265 (KAO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2255082 (LUDWIG ORTHNER, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US2120512 (ERICH ROSENHAUER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB499022 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0543433 | JPH06172133 |