EP0706977 - Glass gob shearing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. One Sea Gate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. One Sea Gate Toledo, Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leidy, Wayne D. 9921 Parliament Place Perrysburg OH 43551 / US | 02 /
Denlinger, Carl E. 720 Inwood Place Maumee OH 43537 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Zwirner, Gottfried Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Zwirner, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-W.-Ing. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenbergerstrasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116074.6 | 12.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940322121 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: US 322121 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0706977 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0706977 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706977 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C03B7/10 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C03B7/10 (EP,US);
C03B33/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | Glaskülbelschneidegerät | [1996/26] | English: | Glass gob shearing apparatus | [1996/16] | French: | Appareil de coupe d'une paraison en verre | [1996/16] |
Former [1996/16] | Glaskübelschneidegerät | Examination procedure | 31.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.10.2001 | Appeal received No. T0015/02 | 03.11.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.02.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0164902 (BHF ENG LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]GB2174693 (EMHART IND) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2249090 (HEYE HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9401371 (GPS GLASPROD SERV GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9411572U (HEYE HERMANN FA [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |