EP0708563 - Image decoding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | Image encoding/decoding device | ||
[2004/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etoh, Minoru 3-6-301, Myokensaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116511.7 | 19.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | JP19940253400 | 19.10.1994 Original published format: JP 25340094 | JP19940270021 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27002194 | JP19950131333 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: JP 13133395 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0708563 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0708563 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708563 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/26 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/94 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (KR);
H04N19/543 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/17] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bilddekodierung | [2004/28] | English: | Image decoding device | [2004/28] | French: | Dispositif pour le décodage d'image | [2004/28] |
Former [1996/17] | Vorrichtung zur Bildkodierung/-dekodierung | ||
Former [1996/17] | Image encoding/decoding device | ||
Former [1996/17] | Dispositif pour le codage/décodage d'image | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.12.2004 | NL | 22.12.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0330455 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 9, line 20 - column 9, line 28 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 18 * * column 16, line 54 - column 17, line 31 * * figures 11,24 *; | [A]EP0434429 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 56 - column 10, line 11 * * figure 12 *; | [X]EP0480353 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [X] 9-12 * page 4, line 1 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 34 * * page 6, line 6 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 36 - page 7, line 55 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]DE4138517 (UNIV HANNOVER [DE]) [A] 23,24 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 37 ** figures 7,8A-D *; | [XA]US5311310 (JOZAWA HIROHISA [US], et al) [X] 9,11 * column 8, line 22 - column 8, line 55 * * figure 2 * [A] 10,12; | [A] - KYOIL KIM ET AL, "BLOCK ARITHMETIC CODING OF CONTOUR IMAGES", VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE PROCESSING '91: VISUAL COMMUNICATION, BOSTON, NOV. 11 - 13, 1991, KOU-HU TZOU;TOSHIO KOGA, (19911111), vol. PART 2, no. VOL. 1605, pages 851 - 862, XP000479291 [A] 1-4 * page 851, line 1 - page 852, line 2 * * page 855, line 27 - page 856, line 8 * | [X] - TING M Y ET AL, "ERROR-DIFFUSED IMAGE COMPRESSION USING A HALFTONE-TO-GRAY-SCALE DECODER AND PREDICTIVE PRUNED TREE-STRUCTURED VECTOR QUANTIZATION", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM - DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS APPLICATIONS SESSION, SEATTLE, MAY 16 - 21, 1993, SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, (19930516), vol. PART 2, no. VOL. 24, pages 227 - 230, XP000645211 [X] 5-8 * abstract * * page 227, column L, line 35 - page 227, column L, line 46 * * page 228, column L, line 5 - page 228, column R, line 56 * | [X] - ZHENHUA XIE ET AL, "PREVISUALIZED IMAGE VECTOR QUANTIZATION WITH OPTIMIZED PRE- AND POSTPROCESSORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19911101), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 1662 - 1671, XP000256982 [X] 5-8 * page 1662, column R, line 37 - page 1663, column L, line 23 * * page 1666, column R, line 31 - page 1666, column R, line L * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.111447 | [XAY] - WANG J Y A ET AL, "REPRESENTING MOVING IMAGES WITH LAYERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (19940901), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 625 - 638, XP000476836 [X] 13,14,17,18,22 * abstract * * page 626, column L, line 18 - page 627, column L, line 6 * * page 628, column L, line 5 - page 632, column L, line 53 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 1-4 [Y] 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.334981 | [XY] - WANG J Y A ET AL, "APPLYING MID-LEVEL VISION TECHNIQUES FOR VIDEO DATA COMPRESSION ANDMANIPULATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19940207), vol. 2187, pages 116 - 127, XP000602741 [X] 15,16 * page 116, line 25 - page 117, line 11 * * page 120, line 24 - page 121, line 21 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.174945 | [X] - MUSMANN H G ET AL, "OBJECT-ORIENTED ANALYSIS-SYNTHESIS CODING OF MOVING IMAGES", SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (19890101), vol. 1, pages 117 - 138, XP000519208 [X] 13,14 * page 118, column R, line 20 - page 121, column L, line 3 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(89)90005-2 | [X] - WEI LI ET AL, "Morphological segmentation applied to displaced frame difference coding", FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MATHEMATICAL MORPHOLOGY AND ITS APPLICATIONS TO SIGNAL PROCESSING, BARCELONA, SPAIN, 10-14 MAY 1993, ISSN 0165-1684, Signal Processing, July 1994, Netherlands, vol. 38, no. 1, pages 45 - 56, XP002092630 [X] 23,24 * abstract * * page 49, column L, line 4 - page 51, column R, line 11 * * page 53, column L, line 9 - page 54, column L, line 10 * * figures 5,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1684(94)90056-6 | [X] - LI W ET AL, "SEGMENTATION BASED CODING OF MOTION COMPENSATED PREDICTION ERROR IMAGES", IMAGE AND MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930427), vol. 5, pages V-357 - V-360, XP000437683 [X] 23,24 * page 358, column L, line 1 - page 359, column L, line 48 * |