EP0712574 - Use of D,L-alpha-lipoic acid, its enantiomers and/or its derivatives as additive for erythrocyte liquid preserves and cryopreserves for homologous and autologous erythrocyte concentrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 01277 Dresden / DE | [2000/13] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states ASTA Medica Aktiengesellschaft An der Pikardie 10 D-01277 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Frank, Dr. Autogenstrasse 8 D-65933 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Henrich, Hermann-August, Prof. Dr. Steinbachtal 44 D-97082 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Geise, Wolfgang, Dr. Bergtheimer Strasse 2 D-97241 Dipbach / DE | 04 /
Ulrich, Heinz, Dr. Bayernstrasse 2 D-63843 Niedernberg / DE | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Decker, Karl-Ludwig Arzneimittelwerk Dresden GmbH Fachbereich Patente Postfach 10 01 57 01435 Radebeul / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 95117109.9 | 31.10.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | DE19944439480 | 08.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4439480 | [1996/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0712574 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0712574 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712574 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/00 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/21] | Title | German: | Verwendung von D,L-alpha-Liponsäure, ihren Enantiomeren, und/oder ihren Derivaten als Zusatz bei Erythrozyten-Flüssig und -Kryokonserven für homologe und autologe Erythrozytenkonzentrate | [1996/21] | English: | Use of D,L-alpha-lipoic acid, its enantiomers and/or its derivatives as additive for erythrocyte liquid preserves and cryopreserves for homologous and autologous erythrocyte concentrates | [1996/21] | French: | Utilisation de l'acide alpha lipoique, ses énantiomères et/ou ses dérivées comme additif des érythrocytes conserves liquides et cryoconserves pour concentrats des erythrocytes homologues et autologues | [1996/21] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0382066 (ASTA PHARMA AG [DE]) [X] 4* the whole document *; | [Y]US5248506 (HOLME STEIN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 38 *; | [Y]US5250303 (MERYMAN HAROLD T [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * table 1 *; | [Y]EP0564880 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [Y] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y] - A. CONSTANTINESCU, H. TRITSCHLER & L. PACKER, "Alpha-Lipoic acid protects against hemolysis of human erythrocytes induced by peroxyl radicals.", BIOCHEM. & MOLEC. BIOL. INTERN., (199407), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 669 - 679, XP002018893 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | [Y] - A. CONSTANTINESCU, D. HAN & L. PACKER, "Vitamin E recycling in human erythrocyte membranes.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19930525), vol. 268, no. 15, pages 10906 - 10913, XP002018894 [Y] 1-7 * page 10912, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 5; table I * |