EP0712057 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | ||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka 410-23 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saegusa, Hisayoshi A-101, Hinoasahigaoka-Highdence, 1-7-18 Asahigaoka Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1996/20] | Fuchs, Luderschmidt & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117208.9 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | JP19940273988 | 08.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27398894 | JP19950243391 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24339195 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0712057 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712057 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
G03G21/0064 (EP,US);
G03G15/00 (KR);
G03G2221/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/20] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [1996/20] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [1996/20] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0538740 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 57 *; | [A]EP0459607 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,4; claim 1 * * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 2 * * column 8, line 39 - line 52 *; | [A]EP0390599 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure 4 * * column 10, line 3 - column 11, line 45 * * column 13, line 32 - column 16, line 40 *; | [A]EP0540341 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1; figure 7 * * column 2, line 41 - line 45 * * column 10, line 57 - column 13, line 43 * | Examination | EP0508355 |