EP0710833 - White trigger preparation for improving signal detection of bio- and chemiluminescent reactions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 112-132 68305 Mannheim / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 112-132 D-68305 Mannheim-Waldhof / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weindel, Kurt, Dr. Am Koppenbergweiher 4 D-82392 Habach / DE | 02 /
Hornauer, Hans, Dr. Antdorfer Strasse 12 D-82392 Habach / DE | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117289.9 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | DE19944439348 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4439348 | [1996/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0710833 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0710833 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G01N21/76, G01N33/58 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
Y10S436/80 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/19] | G01N21/77 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/19] | Title | German: | Weisse Trigger-Präparationen zur Verbesserung der Signaldetektion bei bio- und chemilumineszenten Reaktionen | [1996/19] | English: | White trigger preparation for improving signal detection of bio- and chemiluminescent reactions | [1996/19] | French: | Préparation type trigger pour améliorer la détection des signaux des réactions bio- et chémiluminescentes | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4097338 (KONTTINEN AARNE ILMARI, et al) [A] 1,10-12 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 1 * * column 6, lines 15-22 *; | [A]US5017009 (SCHUTT ERNEST G [US], et al) [A] 1,10-12 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 37 *; | [A]CA2076709 (KRULL ULRICH J [CA], et al) [A] 1,10-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 14, paragraph L * |