EP0711780 - Process for the preparation of liquid crystalline polyorganosiloxanes containing (meth-)acryloxy groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 D-81379 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stohrer, Jürgen, Dr. Becker-Gundahl-Str. 19 D-81479 München / DE | 02 /
Kreuzer, Franz-Heinrich, Dr. Josef-Gerstner-Strasse 14 d D-82152 Martinsried / DE | 03 /
Luckas, Hans-Joachim Gilmstrasse 57f D-81377 München / DE | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117650.2 | 09.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | DE19944440209 | 10.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4440209 | [1996/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711780 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711780 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/21, C07F7/08, C08G77/38, C09K19/38, C09K19/40, G02F1/13, G01N30/48 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
C07F7/0838 (EP,US);
C07F7/0879 (EP,US);
C07F7/21 (EP,US);
C08G77/38 (EP,US);
C09K19/408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung (Meth)acryloxygruppen enthaltender flüssigkristalliner Polyorganosiloxane | [1996/20] | English: | Process for the preparation of liquid crystalline polyorganosiloxanes containing (meth-)acryloxy groups | [1996/20] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyorganosiloxanes liquides cristallines contenant des groupements (méth-)acryloxiques | [1996/20] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5211877 (ANDREJEWSKI DIRK [DE], et al) [DA] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]EP0562584 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column W * | by applicant | US4388453 | US5211877 | DE3110048 |