EP0731180 - Stove cooler for shaft furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states MAN Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofstrasse 66 46145 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubbutat, Axel, Ing. Bremener Strasse 87 D-46145 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Otremba, Werner, Ing. Elsternstrasse 32 D-46145 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
Spickermann, Karl, Ing. Georgstrasse 29 D-46282 Dorsten / DE | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117747.6 | 10.11.1995 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | DE1995103912 | 07.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19503912 | [1996/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731180 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731180 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10, F27B1/24 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
F27B1/24 (EP,US);
C21B7/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | Kühlplatte für Schachtöfen | [1996/37] | English: | Stove cooler for shaft furnaces | [1996/37] | French: | Plaque de refroidissement pour fours à cuve | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2000
11.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE PAUL WURTH S.A. 32, rue d'Alsace 1122 Luxemburg / LU Opponent's representative Schmitt, Armand Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2000
PAUL WURTH S.A. 32, rue d'Alsace 1122 Luxemburg / LU Opponent's representative Schmitt, Armand Office de brevets, Ernest T. Freylinger, 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | 11.05.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2000 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2001 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.12.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/26] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.06.1999 | ES | 17.09.1999 | AT | 10.11.1999 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 16.06.1999 | |
AT | 10.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 10.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2362974 (HOOGOVENS IJMUIDEN BV) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 3; claims 1,5-8 *; | [A]FR2230730 (INST OCHISTKE T [SU]) [A] 1,5* page 4, line 31 - page 6, line 24; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4071230 (ZHERDEV ANATOLY VASILIEVICH, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 46; figures 1,3 *; | [YD]DE2907511 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH, et al) [YD] 1-5 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 2; claim - *; | [YD]DE3925280 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document * |