EP0773567 - Push button switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haschkamp, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Ernst Dreefs-Strasse 7 D-96364 Marktrodach / DE | For all designated states Haschkamp, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Kfm. Ernst Dreefs-Strasse 7 D-96364 Marktrodach / DE | [1997/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prell, Rainer Hubertusstrasse 19 D-95119 Naila / DE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Koch, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr.Haibach, Feldkamp Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Koch, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117794.8 | 10.11.1995 | [1997/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773567 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773567 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/56 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
H01H13/568 (EP);
H01H13/18 (EP);
H01H9/0066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Drucktastenschalter | [1997/20] | English: | Push button switch | [1997/20] | French: | Interrupteur à bouton poussoir | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4659880 (KONDO SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [DY]DE3835931 (HASCHKAMP JOACHIM [DE], et al) [DY] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9413883U (BERKER GEB [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE4404480 (BERKER GEB [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | DE3835931 |