EP0718738 - Thermostatic operational element with an electric resistive heating element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr Thermot-tronik GmbH & Co. Enzstrasse 25 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [1997/20] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states BEHR-THOMSON DEHNSTOFFREGLER GMBH & CO. Enzstrasse 25 D-70806 Kornwestheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saur, Roland Bauernwaldstrasse 127 D-70195 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Leu, Peter Rosenstrasse 7/1 D-73770 Denkendorf / DE | 03 /
Kurz, Manfred Bahmsstrasse 16 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm & Dauster Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95117970.4 | 15.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | DE19944444685 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4444685 | [1996/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0718738 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0718738 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718738 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/00, G05D23/19 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
H05B3/04 (EP,US);
H01H37/44 (KR);
F16K31/00 (KR);
H05B3/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | G05D23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/26] | Title | German: | Thermostatisches Arbeitselement mit einem elektrischen Widerstandsheizelement | [1996/26] | English: | Thermostatic operational element with an electric resistive heating element | [1996/26] | French: | Elément fonctionnel thermostatique avec un élément chauffant à résistance électrique | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05281867 ; | [A]US3266235 (CARLSON JR WILLIAM L) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US3404530 (CHURCHILL WILMER H, et al) [A] 1-8* column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940203), vol. 018, no. 067, Database accession no. (P - 1686), & JP05281867 A 19931029 (CANON INC) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4233913 |