EP0718329 - Process for the preparation of a composition containing a vinylaromatic polymer, a rubber, a mineral filler and a coupling agent and the composition itself [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarraf, Tarek 9 rue du Penin F-64140 Lons / FR | 02 /
Antoine, Hervé 17 Chemin du Bois Basselin F-88100 Saint Die / FR | 03 /
Balard, Henri 84 Rue Principale F-68440 Bruebach / FR | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 95118202.1 | 20.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940015403 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415403 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718329 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F279/02, C08F291/02, C08L51/04, C08F292/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
C08F292/00 (EP);
C08L25/04 (KR);
C08F279/04 (EP);
C08L21/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zusammensetzung aus einem Vinylaromatischen Polymerisat, einem Kautschuk, einem mineralischen Füllstoff und einem Haftvermittler und die Zusammensetzung selbst | [1996/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of a composition containing a vinylaromatic polymer, a rubber, a mineral filler and a coupling agent and the composition itself | [1996/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une composition comprenant un polymère vinylaromatique, un caoutchouc, une charge minérale et un agent de couplage, et la composition ainsi obtenue | [1996/26] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 28.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/28] | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3536785 (WILBUR BENJAMIN C) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,10-12,17 * example 6; table III *; | JPS59159809 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US3855194 (CONARD W) [A] 1,6,17 * example 2 * | [A] - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., "thermosetting molding compositions", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19841224), vol. 101, no. 26, Database accession no. 231503m, page 33, column 2, XP002000824 [A] 1,5-7,9,11,17 * abstract * | by applicant | GB1528094 |