EP0777077 - Lubricant dispenser with electric motor controlled dispensing of lubricant to a machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perma-Tec GmbH & Co. KG Hammelburger Strasse 21 97717 Euerdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG Hammelburger Str. 21 97717 Euerdorf / DE | ||
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states Satzinger GmbH & Co. Hammelburger Strasse 21 97717 Euerdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Walter Fasanenweg 11 D-97717 Euerdorf / DE | 02 /
Immisch, Ulrich Hartmannstrasse 19 D-97768 Bad Kissingen / DE | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95118824.2 | 30.11.1995 | [1997/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777077 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777077 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16N11/08 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F16N11/08 (EP,US);
F16N29/00 (EP,US);
B05C17/0103 (EP,US);
F16N2230/02 (EP,US);
F16N2260/12 (EP,US);
F16N2270/20 (EP,US);
F16N2270/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | Schmierstoffspender mit elektromotorisch gesteuerter Abgabe eines Schmierstoffes an eine Maschine | [1997/23] | English: | Lubricant dispenser with electric motor controlled dispensing of lubricant to a machine | [1997/23] | French: | Distributeur à graisse pour délivrance commandé par moteur électrique d'une graisse à une machine | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | AT | 30.11.2002 | LU | 30.11.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/14] | DK | 27.06.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | DK | 27.06.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0429061 ; | [A]GB215205 (RALPH REDMAN MCCLURE) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4089624 (NICHOLS PHILIP THORBUS, et al) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0344435 (BAIER & KOEPPEL [DE]) [A] 5* abstract *; | [XA]US5271528 (CHIEN HUI-MEI [TW]) [X] 1,4,8,9,13,14,20 * the whole document * [A] 12,15; | [X]EP0598678 (GROSSENBACHER BEAT [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE4321452 (KOZLOWSKI EDMUND [DE]) [X] 1,4,9,13,20 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5,8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920512), vol. 016, no. 197, Database accession no. (P - 1350), & JP04029061 A 19920131 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4209776 | DE19934331947 |