EP0715195 - Optical semiconductor device module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroshi Suda, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Takeshi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Nemoto, Hirofumi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Akinobu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95118962.0 | 01.12.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | JP19940299702 | 02.12.1994 Original published format: JP 29970294 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715195 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715195 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G02B6/4246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/23] | Title | German: | Optisches Halbleitermodul | [1996/23] | English: | Optical semiconductor device module | [1996/23] | French: | Tête optique à semi-conducteur | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0197841 (SOCAPEX [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 6, line 6 - line 22 * * figure 4 *; | [X]EP0250331 (DEUTSCH SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0559551 (THOMSON HYBRIDES [FR]) [X] 1,2* the whole document * | Examination | US4767171 | US5408559 |