EP0721085 - A headlamp for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hideyuki 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. / JP | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/28] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119077.6 | 04.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | JP19940307947 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30794794 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721085 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721085 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, F21V5/00, F21S2/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F21S41/24 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/28] | F21V8/00, F21M3/12, F21V5/00, F21S5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1996/28] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugscheinwerfer | [1996/28] | English: | A headlamp for a vehicle | [1996/28] | French: | Projecteur d'un véhicule | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2240780 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [A] 1,5; | [DX]DE4320554 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [DX] 1,3-13; | [A]DE4325115 (DOCTER OPTIK WETZLAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5; | [A]GB1365324 (MCGILL G A) [A] 1,5; | [A]GB1584690 (ZEISS STIFTUNG) [A] 1,5; | [A]US4389698 (CIBIE PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,5; | [A]US5257168 (DAVENPORT JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1,5; | [A]US5365412 (KOPPOLU PRASAD M [US], et al) [A] 1,5; | [A]EP0532262 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,5; | [A]EP0623780 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,5 | by applicant | JPH0668702 |