EP0721976 - Fluorescent materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popall, Michael, Dr. rer. nat. Weingartenstrasse 26 D-97072 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Gert, Dr. rer. nat. Steinburgstrasse 44 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Holger Günterslebenerstrasse 47 D-97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | 04 /
Spanhel, Lubomir, Dr. rer. nat. Bronnbachergasse 19 D-97070 Würzburg / DE | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/34] |
Former [2002/47] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke, Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119256.6 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | DE19951000634 | 11.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19500634 | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721976 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721976 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721976 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/29] | Title | German: | Fluoreszierende Materialien | [1996/29] | English: | Fluorescent materials | [1996/29] | French: | Matériaux fluorescents | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.10.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/08] | deleted | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0612772 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * column W *; | [A] - MATTHEWS, LOWELL R. ET AL, "Luminescence behavior of inorganic and metalorganic europium(III) dopants incorporated into silica and epoxy-diol ORMOSIL sol-gel hosts", J. SOL-GEL SCI. TECHNOL. (1994), 2(1/2/3), 627-34 CODEN: JSGTEC;ISSN: 0928-0707, (1994), XP002009809 [A] 1-20 | [A] - MATTHEWS L R ET AL, "CONCENTRATION EFFECTS ON THE LUMINESCENCE BEHAVIOR OF EUROPIUM (III) CHLORIDE- AND ORGANOEUROPIUM-DOPED SILICATE GELS", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (19941103), vol. 178, pages 44 - 51, XP000483314 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(94)90263-1 | [A] - BESCHER E P ET AL, "Rare earth/organic dye nanocomposites by the sol-gel method", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002009859 [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [ ] - MOLECULARLY DESIGNED ULTRAFINE/NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS SYMPOSIUM, MOLECULARLY DESIGNED ULTRAFINE/NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS SYMPOSIUM, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 4-8 APRIL 1994, 1994, PITTSBURGH, PA, USA, MATER. RES. SOC, USA, pages 135 - 139 |