EP0716114 - (Meth)acryloxy-functional organosilicon compounds, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [1998/10] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dauth, Jochen, Dr. Piracherstr. 78 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Herzig, Christian, Dr. Ludwig-Felber-Strasse 16 D-83329 Feichten-Waging / DE | 03 /
Deubzer, Bernward, Dr. Virchowstr. 14 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
Hierstetter, Thomas, Dr. Wöhlerstrasse 6 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | 05 /
Gratzl, Petra Moos 13 1/2 D-84577 Tüssling / DE | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Deffner-Lehner, Maria, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Deffner-Lehner, Maria, et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119302.8 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | DE19944443749 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4443749 | [1996/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716114 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716114 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/38, C09D183/06 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
C08G77/38 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C09D183/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/24] | Title | German: | (Meth)acryloxygruppen aufweisende Organosiliciumverbindungen, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1998/10] | English: | (Meth)acryloxy-functional organosilicon compounds, their preparation and their use | [1996/24] | French: | Composés organosiliciés comportant des groupes (méth)acryloxy, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1996/24] |
Former [1996/24] | (Meth)acryloxygruppen aufweisende Organoiliciumverbindungen, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 07.12.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0284863 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-6 * * page 3, line 1 - line 8 *; | [DA]WO9205854 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* claims 1,10 *; | [Y]EP0503668 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [DY]EP0508491 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1 * claims 1-12 *; | [PA]DE4325359 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * claims 1-7 * |