EP0721759 - Shower partition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING B.V. Wilhelminasingel 118 NL-6221 BL Maastricht / NL | [1996/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Klose, Hans, et al Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Reble & Klose, Bereich Patente & Marken, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119353.1 | 08.12.1995 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | DE1995200499U | 13.01.1995 Original published format: DE 29500499 U | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721759 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22, E05D7/04, E05D5/02 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05D5/0246 (EP);
E05D7/04 (EP);
A47K2003/307 (EP);
E05Y2800/672 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/29] | Title | German: | Duschabtrennung | [1996/29] | English: | Shower partition | [1996/29] | French: | Cloison de douche | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/32] | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2026913 (GROHE KG HANS) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2391341 (BFG GLASSGROUP [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 10 * * page 7, line 5 - line 12; figure 7 *; | [A]DE2952574 (ACO GIESSEREI KUNSTSTOFFVERARB [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0087822 (ROLOFF HEINZ RUDOLF) [A] 9* column W *; | [AD]EP0187190 (MUNCH PAUL JEAN) [AD] 1 * column W * | by applicant | EP0187190 |