EP0717520 - CDMA communication system in which interference removing capability is improved [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Shousei, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ushirokawa, Akihisa, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119441.4 | 08.12.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | JP19940307275 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30727594 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0717520 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0717520 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717520 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/00, H04B1/707 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
H04J13/0003 (EP,US);
H04B1/7097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1996/25] | Title | German: | CDMA Kommunikationssystem, in dem die Fähigkeit zur Interferenzbeseitigung verbessert ist | [1996/25] | English: | CDMA communication system in which interference removing capability is improved | [1996/25] | French: | Système de communication à AMRC avec capacité d'élimination d'interférence améliorée | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.01.2006 | [2006/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5327455 (DE GAUDENZI RICCARDO [NL], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - line 48 * * column 2, line 55 - line 64 * * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 14 * * column 6, line 19 - line 34 *; | [X] - GAUDENZI DE R ET AL, "SYNCHRONOUS TRELLIS-CODED CDMA: ANALYSIS AND SYSTEM PERFORMANCE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930523), VOL. 3, no. -, pages 1444 - 1448, XP000448379 [X] 1-18 * page 1444 - page 1446 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397526 | [X] - QING ZHANG ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF TRELLIS-CODED QPSK/SS SYSTEMS WITH LONG PN SEQUENCE COMBATTING MULTIPLE-ACCESS AND TONE INTERFERENCES", PROCEEDINGS TENCON'93, IEEE REGION 10, CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER, COMMUNICATION, CONTROL AND POWEER ENGINEERING, BEIJING, CHINA, (19931019), vol. 3, pages 83 - 86, XP002069241 [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 83, column 2, line 1 - page 84, column 1, line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1993.327928 | [A] - YUKIJI YAMAUCHI ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF MULTIPLE ACCESS CAPABILITY IN M-ARY-FSK/DIRECT-SEQUENCE SSMA", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 1, (198603), vol. 69, no. 3, pages 86 - 92, XP002069254 [A] 1-18 * summary *; page 87, column 1, line 1 - page 89, column 1, line 4 * | [DA] - YOSHIDA S ET AL, "DS/CDMA ADAPTIVE INTERFERENCE CANCELLER ON DIFFERENTIAL DETECTION IN FAST FADING CHANNEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, STOCKHOLM, JUNE 8 - 10, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940608), VOL. 2, no. CONF. 44, pages 780 - 784, XP000496782 [DA] 1-18 * the whole document * |