EP0719821 - Water repellent surface treatment for plastic and coated plastic substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Helmut 201 Ridge Road Pittsburg, Pa. 15238 / US | 02 /
Goodwin, George B. 8604 Peters Road Cranberry Township, Pa. 16066 / US | 03 /
Marietti, Gary J. Richhill Road, Richhill Estates, Box 56 Cheswick, Pa. 15024 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, et al polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann, Dr. Hans-Günther Sternagel, Dr. Hans Dörries, Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119450.5 | 11.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940363804 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: US 363804 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719821 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C09K3/18 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/328 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/054 (KR);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Wasserabweisende Oberflächenbehandlung für Kunststoff und beschichtete Kunststoffoberflächen | [1996/27] | English: | Water repellent surface treatment for plastic and coated plastic substrates | [1996/27] | French: | Traitement pour hydrofuger des surfaces en matière plastique et les surfaces ainsi traitées | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/38] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0545201 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DX] 1-20 * claims 1-20 * * examples 11,12 *; | [D]US5328768 (GOODWIN GEORGE B [US]) | by applicant | US4983459 | EP0513690 | US5308705 | US19940220353 |