|
05.01.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
23.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
29 |
|
22.09.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
22.08.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
34 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
111 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.02.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
03.04.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |