EP0718339 - Carbamate-functional polyester polymer or oligomer having pendant carbamate groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive, New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive, New Jersey 08728-1234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menovcik, Gregory G. 26238 Farmington Road Farmington Hills, Michigan 48334 / US | 02 /
Ohrbom, Walter H. 4915 Sundew Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Münch, Volker, et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Münch, Volker, Dr., et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1996/26] | Münch, Volker, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119723.5 | 14.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | US19940361245 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: US 361245 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0718339 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0718339 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718339 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/685, C09D167/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
C08G63/6854 (EP,US);
C08G63/42 (KR);
C09D167/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/00, C08L61/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Carbamat-funktionelles Polyester Polymer oder Oligomer mit hängenden Carbamat-Gruppen | [1996/26] | English: | Carbamate-functional polyester polymer or oligomer having pendant carbamate groups | [1996/26] | French: | Polymère ou oligomère de polyester à fonction carbamate ayant des groupes carbamates pendants | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.06.2004 | IT | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | GB | 14.12.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/13] | BE | 02.06.2004 | |
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
GB | 14.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | BE | 02.06.2004 | |
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 02.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5451656 (MENOVCIK GREGORY L [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4-12,14-24 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0403132 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,10 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]US5373069 (REHFUSS JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1,18-24 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]US3464938 (NORDSTROM JOHN DAVID) [A] 18-24 * column 2, line 6 - line 12; claims 1,4 * | by applicant | US5356669 | WO9410211 | JPS514124 |