EP0720390 - Non-linear color corrector and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zortea, Anthony E. 5129 Meadowbrook Place Pipersville, Pennsylvania 18947 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120188.8 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940367798 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: US 367798 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720390 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720390 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720390 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
H04N9/646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/27] | Title | German: | Nichtlineare Farbkorrekturvorrichtung und geeignetes Verfahren | [1999/37] | English: | Non-linear color corrector and method thereof | [1996/27] | French: | Correcteur non linéaire de couleur et méthode associée | [1996/27] |
Former [1996/27] | Nichtlineare Farbkorrektionsvorrichtung und geeignetes Verfahren | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05276371 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940131), vol. 18, no. 60, Database accession no. (E - 1499), & JP05276371 A 19931022 (SANYO) [X] 1,6,11 * abstract * | [X] - SID-AHMED, "selective color tone adjustment for advanced television systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK US, (199411), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 938 - 943, XP000495834 [X] 1,6,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.338343 | Examination | - 2nd. IEEE Int. Conf. on Fuzzy Syst. S.F., Ca., USA, March 28 to April 1, 1993, vol. II, pages 1383 to 1388; Po-Rong Chang et al: "Model-Reference Neural Color Correction for HDTV Syst. based on Fuzzy Information Criteria" |