EP0719902 - Mobile partition wall element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hüppe Form Raumtrennsysteme GmbH Cloppenburger Strasse 200 26133 Oldenburg / DE | [1999/35] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states Hüppe Form Sonnenschutz- und Raumtrennsysteme GmbH Cloppenburger Strasse 200 D-26133 Oldenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Jens Am Freikamp 15 a D-27793 Wildeshausen / DE | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120220.9 | 20.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | DE19940020808U | 23.12.1994 Original published format: DE 9420808 U | [1996/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719902 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719902 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
E04B2/827 (EP);
E05D15/0608 (EP);
E05Y2800/00 (EP);
E05Y2900/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahrbares Trennwandelement | [1996/27] | English: | Mobile partition wall element | [1996/27] | French: | Elément de cloison mobile | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 18.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.07.1999 | SE | 07.07.1999 | DK | 07.10.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | SE | 07.07.1999 | |
DK | 07.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 07.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS54128144 (MATSUDA ETSUICHI) [Y] 4 * figures 1-7 *[A] 7,11,12; | [XAY]US5090171 (KANO MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,13-16 * column 2, line 61 - line 66 * * column 3, line 9 - line 21 * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 * * column 4, line 18 - line 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 12 [Y] 4 |