EP0719019 - Method for delivering a message in one of several languages and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/27] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopp, Dieter Hirschstrasse 34 D-71282 Hemmingen / DE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Schätzle, Albin, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen, Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120276.1 | 21.12.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | DE19944446520 | 24.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4446520 | [1996/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719019 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719019 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719019 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/65, H04M1/64, H04M3/50 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H04M3/533 (EP);
H04M1/642 (EP);
H04M2203/2061 (EP);
H04M2242/22 (EP);
H04M2250/58 (EP);
H04M3/42059 (EP);
H04Q3/72 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | H04M1/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren für ein Ausgeben einer Ansage in einer von mehreren Sprachen und Vorrichtung dafür | [1996/26] | English: | Method for delivering a message in one of several languages and apparatus therefor | [1996/26] | French: | Méthode de délivrance d'un message dans une langue parmi plusieurs et dispositif associé | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 18.12.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.11.2001 | AT | 21.12.2001 | BE | 31.12.2001 | CH | 31.12.2001 | LI | 31.12.2001 | SE | 14.02.2002 | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/16] | NL | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | NL | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 31.12.2001 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0307137 (HASHIMOTO CORP [JP]) [AD] 1,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 57 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4985913 (SHALOM STEPHEN R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 34 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP0455912 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 18 - line 34 * * column 5, line 13 - line 51 * * column 7, line 12 - column 8, line 8 * * column 9, line 12 - line 36 * * column 10, line 37 - line 58 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0567135 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 19 - line 26 * * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 2 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US5333180 (BROWN PERCY B [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 3 * * column 4, line 2 - column 6, line 67 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 4 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 16 * * column 12, line 41 - line 56 * * column 14, line 33 - line 51 * * figures 1,11,12 *; | [PX]US5440615 (CACCURO JOHN A [US], et al) [PX] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - line 66 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, line 4 - line 63 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 11 * * figures 1-6 * |