EP0719677 - Robbery-proof mechanism for vehicle mounted electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Kazuya 2-11-7-301 Higashifushimi Houya-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Masayoshi 271-1-201 Naganuma-cho Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Muramatsu, Jun 8840-4-201 Minamiminowa-mura Kamiina-gun, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Masumoto, Tohru 2-51-1-202 Kuboyama-cho Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsumoto, Masami 2-11-13-101 Sakae-cho Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Hosoi, Kiyoshi 1800 Ishihata, Mizuho-machi Nishitama-gun, Tokyo / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/27] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120300.9 | 21.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940339875 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33987594 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719677 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719677 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B60R11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/27] | Title | German: | Diebstahlsicherer Mechanismus für ein, in einem Fahrzeug montiertes, elektronisches Gerät | [1996/27] | English: | Robbery-proof mechanism for vehicle mounted electronic apparatus | [1996/27] | French: | Mécanisme antivol pour un appareil électronique monté dans un véhicule | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3537371 (BAUMBACH GUENTER DIPL ING) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 30 - line 47; figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE3538224 (SCHAEFER ERWIN) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 16; figures 2,3 * |