EP0719663 - Device for estimating air pressure of tire from vibration components of vehicle wheel speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohashi, Hideki 1028 Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken 410-11 / JP | 02 /
Kawai, Hiroyuki 314-6 Ishiwaki Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 410-11 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Hiroyoshi 230-3 Kamezawa-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Asano, Katsuhiro 14-3 Yutakadai, Misaki-cho Toyoake-shi, Aichi-ken, 470-11 / JP | 05 /
Umeno, Takaji, 303 Nagakute Shataku 41-3 Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute, Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | 06 /
Naito, Toshiharu 24-3 Kazami, Inai-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 07 /
Onogi, Nobuyoshi 1-94 Morinosato, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 08 /
Inoue, Yuuichi 27-10, Higashi-Oohori, Kagiya-cho Tokai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120487.4 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940337253 | 26.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33725394 | JP19950278338 | 02.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27833895 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719663 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719663 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/06 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
B60C23/062 (EP,US);
B60C23/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/27] | Title | German: | Reifendruckabschätzungseinrichtung auf Basis der Schwingungskomponente der Drehgeschwindigkeit von Fahrzeugrädern | [1996/27] | English: | Device for estimating air pressure of tire from vibration components of vehicle wheel speed | [1996/27] | French: | Dispositif d'estimation de la pression d'un pneumatique portant des composants des vibrations de vitesses de rotation des roues d'un véhicule | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0578826 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0636503 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * figure -; claims 25,26 *; | [E]EP0695653 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al) [E] 1 * page 2, line 32 - line 35 ** page 3, line 16 - line 44; figure - * | Examination | JPH06122304 |