EP0720991 - Copolymers of ethylene and tetrafluoroethylene and/or chlorotrifluoroethylene having improved mechanical properties at high temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31 Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milano / IT | [1996/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abusleme, Julio A. Via Bergamo, 5 Saronno, Varese / IT | 02 /
Colaianna, Pasqua Via Popoli Uniti, 17 Milano / IT | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Sama, Daniele, et al Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents Via Morgagni, 2 I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95120725.7 | 29.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00009 | 04.01.1995 Original published format: IT MI950009 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0720991 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0720991 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720991 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02, C08F214/24, C08F214/26, C08F214/18 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F214/18 (KR);
C08F214/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/28] | C08F210/02, C08F214/24, C08F214/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | Copolymere aus Ethylen und Tetrafluorethylen und/oder Chlortrifluorethylen mit verbesserten mechanischen Eigenschaften bei hohen Temperaturen | [1996/28] | English: | Copolymers of ethylene and tetrafluoroethylene and/or chlorotrifluoroethylene having improved mechanical properties at high temperatures | [1996/28] | French: | Copolymères d'éthylène et de tétrafluoroéthylène et/ou chlorotrifluoroéthylène ayant des propriétés mécaniques améliorées à des températures élevées | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.1999 | CH | 17.03.1999 | GR | 17.03.1999 | LI | 17.03.1999 | SE | 17.03.1999 | DK | 17.06.1999 | PT | 17.06.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
CH | 17.03.1999 | ||
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
LI | 17.03.1999 | ||
SE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
CH | 17.03.1999 | ||
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
LI | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
CH | 17.03.1999 | ||
LI | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
CH | 22.06.1999 | ||
LI | 22.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 17.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0043948 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0073087 (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-8 * example 5; claim - *; | [DA]EP0185241 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [DA] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]US5285002 (GROOTAERT WERNER M [US]) [A] 1-8* claims 1-4 *; | [DPY]EP0633257 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [DPY] 1-8 * the whole document * |