EP0761090 - Automatic device for irrigation with or without special water droppers including a water dropper tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALITECO AG Alpenstrasse 14 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sgherri, Mauro, c/o Aliteco AG Alpenstrasse 14 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
Caprioli, Pier Luigi, c/o Aliteco AG Alpenstrasse 14 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95120744.8 | 29.12.1995 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | EP19950113553 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: EP 95113553 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761090 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01G27/00 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A01G27/005 (EP);
A01G27/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Selbsttätige Vorrichtung zur Bewässerung, mit oder ohne einem Vorratsbehälter versehenen Tropfenzählern | [1997/11] | English: | Automatic device for irrigation with or without special water droppers including a water dropper tank | [1997/11] | French: | Appareil automatique pour l'irrigation, avec ou sans compte-gouttes munis d'un réservoir distributeur | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/23] | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3546459 (WITTE & SUTOR) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [YA]US5315787 (SCHLEICHER ET AL.) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 49; figure -; claim 2 * [A] 1; | [XA]DE2537135 (KERN) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [AD]FR2267699 (MARTINEZ MARTINEZ) [AD] 1,5,6 * figure - *; | [A]GB2176382 (JOHNSON) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 72 - line 105; figure - *; | [A]DE2556536 (GRATZA); | [AD]WO8706095 (TRICARICO); | [AD]DE2336739 (BIANCACCI ET AL.) |