EP0663670 - Method for setting-up a cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANSEE Aktiengesellschaft 6600 Reutte, Tirol / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states PLANSEE Aktiengesellschaft A-6600 Reutte, Tirol / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rainer, Florian Lechtaler Strasse 37a A-6600 Lechaschau / AT | 02 /
Reheis, Nikolaus Jerzens 10 A-6460 Jerzens 10 / AT | [1995/29] | Representative(s) | Lohnert, Wolfgang Lähn 12 6600 Breitenwang / Reutte / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Lohnert, Wolfgang, Dr. Plansee Aktiengesellschaft A-6600 Reutte / AT | Application number, filing date | 95200029.7 | 09.01.1995 | [1995/29] | Priority number, date | AT19940000066 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: AT 6694 | [1995/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663670 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663670 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21B1/00, H05H1/12 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
F28F21/02 (EP,US);
G21B1/13 (EP,US);
Y02E30/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49364 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1995/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kühleinrichtung | [1995/29] | English: | Method for setting-up a cooling system | [1995/29] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un dispositif de refroidissement | [1995/29] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0465041 ; | [Y]DD140798 ; | [A]JPH01249288 ; | [A]EP0142673 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5023043 (KOTZLOWSKI HEINZ E [DE], et al) [DA] 1-3 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 10 * * claims 8,10 *; | [XY]WO9313636 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 1 - line 14 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 32 * [Y] 3,5; | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920618), vol. 016, no. 271, Database accession no. (E - 1218), & JP04065041 A 19920302 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * [A] 1,2,4 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 25, no. 80, Database accession no. 80-f3931c, & DD140798 A 19800327 (H.U. TSCHIRNER) [Y] 5 * abstract * | [A] - GOTOH ET AL., "High heat load tests of a graphite armor first wall with a water cooling jacket", FUSION ENGINEERING AND DESIGN, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 9, pages 295 - 300 [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 295, paragraph 1 - page 296, paragraph L * | [A] - SCHLOSSER ET AL., "Development of high thermal flux components for continuous operation in tokamaks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH IEEE/NPSS SYMPOSIUM ON FUSION ENGINEERING, SAN DIEGO, CA - 30 SEPT./3 OCT. 1991, vol. 1, pages 350 - 356, XP000453528 [A] 1 * page 350, paragraph 1 - paragraph L * * page 356, column R, paragraph 1 * | [A] - IOKI K ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF HIGH CONDUCTIVE C/C COMPOSITE TILES FOR PLASMA FACING ARMOR", FUSION ENGINEERING AND DESIGN, vol. 1, no. 15, pages 31 - 38, XP000225759 [A] 1,4 * page 36, paragraph L - page 37, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-3796(91)80006-Z | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891226), vol. 013, no. 591, Database accession no. (M - 913), & JP01249288 A 19891004 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |