EP0727892 - Method of testing a data frame processing unit or a line termination module in synchronous digital hierarchy (SDH) applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BELL Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen 1 / BE | [1996/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van De Pol, Daniel Frans Jozefina Acacialei 5 B-2930 Brassschaat / BE | 02 /
Moerman, Erik Lemberge Steenweg 128 B-9820 Bottelare / BE | 03 /
David, Johan Kapucijnenvoer 122, Bus 62 B-3000 Leuven / BE | 04 /
Van Tetering, Johannes Anthonius Maria de Lint 113 NL-4761 XN Zevenbergen / NL | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 95200398.6 | 20.02.1995 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727892 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/24, H04L12/26, H04J3/14 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04L1/24 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/34] | Title | German: | Testmethode für Datenrahmen-Verarbeitungsschaltungen oder Leitungsendmodulen in SDH-Anwendungen | [1996/34] | English: | Method of testing a data frame processing unit or a line termination module in synchronous digital hierarchy (SDH) applications | [1996/34] | French: | Méthode pour tester une unité de traitement de trame de données ou une unité de terminaison de ligne dans un réseau de type SDH | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 21.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9413073 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 26 - page 4, line 17 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 31; figure - *; | [A]US5289474 (PURCELL JOSEPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - line 55 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 46 * * column 5, line 54 - line 68 * * column 9, line 5 - line 8 * * column 9, line 64 - line 67 *; | [A] - G. RHIND:, "The Test Challenge of SONET.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS FORUM, 30.09.-02.10.1991, CHICAGO US, (19910930), vol. 45, pages 420 - 423, XP000267438 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |