EP0690251 - Partially prepressed soft material gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.W. Schultze GmbH Altes Feld 4 D-22885 Barsbüttel / DE | [1996/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenz, Maik Rethkoppel 32 D 22399 Hamburg / DE | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Siewers, Gescha, et al Harmsen & Utescher Rechts- und Patentanwälte Alter Wall 55 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Siewers, Gescha, Dr., et al Rechtsanwälte Dres. Harmsen, Utescher pp. Adenauerallee 28 D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95200431.5 | 21.02.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | DE19940010681U | 02.07.1994 Original published format: DE 9410681 U | [1996/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690251 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690251 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/12 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
F16J15/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/01] | Title | German: | Partiell vorgepresste Weichstoffdichtungen | [1996/01] | English: | Partially prepressed soft material gasket | [1996/01] | French: | Joint partiellement pré-pressé en matériau souple | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4676515 (COBB DAVID A [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 36 - line 64; figure - *; | [A]DE3702452 (GOETZE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-9 * abstract *; | [AD]DE9212104U (SCHULTZE) [AD] 1-5,7-9* figure .; claim - * |