EP0674880 - Biodegradable screw for bone surgery, and corresponding screwdriver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/40] | Biodegradable osteosynthesis screw and corresponding screwdriver | ||
[1996/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stähelin, Andreas C., Dr. med. St. Alban-Vorstadt 51 CH-4052 Basel / CH | [1995/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Köver, François Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Köver, François Schmauder & Wann Patentanwaltsbüro Zwängiweg 7 CH-8038 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1995/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1995/40] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 473 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95200700.3 | 22.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | CH19940000938 | 29.03.1994 Original published format: CH 93894 | CH19940003757 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: CH 375794 | [1995/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674880 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674880 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, F16B23/00, A61B17/86 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
F16B23/0007 (EP,US);
A61B17/8615 (EP,US);
A61B17/864 (EP,US);
A61B17/8645 (EP,US);
A61B17/8875 (EP,US);
A61B17/888 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | Schraube aus bioabbaubarem Material für osteochirurgische Zwecke, sowie dazu passender Schraubendreher | [1995/40] | English: | Biodegradable screw for bone surgery, and corresponding screwdriver | [1996/52] | French: | Vis biodégradable pour la chirurgie osseuse, et tournevis correspondant | [1996/50] |
Former [1995/40] | Biodegradable osteosynthesis screw and corresponding screwdriver | ||
Former [1995/40] | Vis d'ostéosynthèse biodégradable et tournevis correspondant | Examination procedure | 04.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 04.11.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.03.1997 | AT | 22.03.1997 | IE | 27.06.1997 | [2002/10] |
Former [1999/16] | IE | 11.12.1996 | |
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
AT | 22.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | SE | 11.03.1997 | |
AT | 22.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 11.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146073 (LLITERAS JUAN A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2022482 (FENTON J W) [A] 4,5* abstract *; | [A]DE8804456U (AESCULAP) [A] 1 * figures 1,5; claims 1,3,7 *; | [AD]EP0502698 (LINVATEC CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5269209 (BAKER DAVID R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | - Handbuch der Mathematik; Buch und Zeit Verlagsges.m.b.H. Köln; Seite 178 | - Schülerduden "Die Mathematik"; Bibliographisches Institut AG, Mannheim 1982; Seiten 433, 518-521 |