EP0691577 - Method for making a lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Rompuy, Ludo, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V: DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Van Hunsel, Johan, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V: DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1996/02] | Application number, filing date | 95201272.2 | 16.05.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | EP19940201942 | 06.07.1994 Original published format: EP 94201942 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691577 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/07, H04N1/40, G03F5/00 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
H04N1/4051 (EP);
G03F5/00 (EP);
G03F7/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischer Druckplatte | [1996/02] | English: | Method for making a lithographic printing plate | [1996/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression lithographique | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/05] | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0598241 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD.) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 22 - line 38 * * page 4, line 25 - line 47 *; | [Y]US5175804 (DEAN K WITTMANN) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 28 - line 50 * * column 18, line 11 - line 16; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0496127 (AGFA-GEVAERT NV) [Y] 1-10 * page 5, line 18 - line 32 *; | [Y]EP0423399 (AGFA-GEVAERT NV) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 18 *; | [Y]JPH0196648 ; | [A]EP0571010 (AGFA-GEVAERT NV) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0639023 (AGFA-GEVAERT NV) [PA] 1-10 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 50 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 21, Database accession no. 89-155301, & JPH0196648 A 19890414 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |