EP0718918 - Connector with spring contact member and shorting means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | For:FR
DE
CH
LI
NL
SE
IE
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For:GB
CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | ||
For:FR
DE
CH
LI
NL
SE
IE
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL | |||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V. Julianaplein 22 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meller, Andrew Graham Mozartlaan 4 NL-5251 HK Vlijmen / NL | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201380.3 | 24.05.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | EP19940203702 | 20.12.1994 Original published format: EP 94203702 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718918 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718918 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24, H01R13/648 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
H01R13/2428 (EP);
H01R13/6485 (EP);
H01R13/7032 (EP);
H01R13/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL, SE [1996/39] |
Former [1996/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steckverbinder mit federndem Kontakt und Kurzschlussanordnung | [1996/26] | English: | Connector with spring contact member and shorting means | [1996/26] | French: | Connecteur avec contact à ressort et des moyens de court-circuitage | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.12.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, IT, LU, MC, PT | 17.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.1996 | 31.01.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4734051 (BURNS EDGAR [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 32; figures 1,2 * [A] 11,12; | [YA]US4778404 (PASS RAYMOND V [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 16 - line 51; figures 1-4 * [A] 6,9; | [YA]US4161346 (CHERIAN GABRIEL B [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 27 - line 37; figure 1 * [A] 6; | [A]EP0256541 (FEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7,9 * page 3, column 3, line 26 - page 5, column 7, line 4; figures 3,7,19-23 *; | [A]DE4344272 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 8 * column 8, line 13 - line 26; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0573690 (SPRECHER ENERGIE AG [CH]) [A] 13,14 * page 3, column 3, line 4 - line 42; figure 3 * | by applicant | US4954087 | US3903385 | US4070557 | US4773877 | EP19940202140 |