EP0685949 - Packet transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1995/49] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reumermann, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwalt. GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
van Wageningen, Andries c/o Philips Patentverwalt. GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95201420.7 | 31.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | DE19944419344 | 03.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419344 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685949 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685949 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/43, H04J3/08, H04L12/56 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/108 (EP,US);
H04L49/608 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5681 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5685 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/49] | H04L12/43, H04J3/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Paketübermittlungssystem | [1995/49] | English: | Packet transmission system | [1995/49] | French: | Système de transmission de paquets | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/44] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4603416 (SERVEL MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0502436 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 10, line 20 - line 46; figure 7 * * column 4, line 33 - column 7, line 47; figures 1,2 * * column 11, line 48 - column 13, line 44; figures 10,11 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP0581486 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 6, line 16 - line 37; figure 2 * * column 17, line 50 - column 19, line 26 * * column 15, line 43 - column 16, line 41 * [A] 3; | [XY]US5285444 (SAKURAI YOSHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 10; figure 5 * [Y] 3; | [A]US5301192 (HENRION MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,4,5,8,9 * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 3 *; | [A] - YAMANAKA H ET AL, 622 Mb/s 8/spl times/8 shared multibuffer ATM switch with hierarchical queueing and multicast functions, GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI-CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL PROGRAM CONFERENCE RECORD, IEEE IN HOUSTON. GLOBECOM '93., IEEE HOUSTON, TX, USA 29 NOV.-2 DEC. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 1488-1495, ISBN 0-7803-0917-0, XP010109830 [A] 3 * page 1491, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1993.318319 |