EP0687608 - Double-acting clamp for coupling a funicular vehicle to the running cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEITNER S.p.A. Via Brennero 34 I-39049 Vipiteno (Bolzano) / IT | [1995/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levi, Ferruccio Via Tintoretto, 40 I-20093 Cologno Monzese (Milan) / IT | 02 /
Conte, Giuseppe Via Verona, 21 I-39100 Bolzano / IT | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Appoloni, Romano Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.P.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Appoloni, Romano Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.P.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/51] | Appoloni, Romano Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95201592.3 | 15.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI01255 | 16.06.1994 Original published format: IT MI941255 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687608 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687608 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/12, B61B9/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B61B9/00 (EP,US);
B61B12/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT [1995/51] | Extension states | SI | 15.06.1995 | Title | German: | Doppeltwirkende Klemme zum Ankuppeln eines Fahrzeuges an das Zugkabel | [1995/51] | English: | Double-acting clamp for coupling a funicular vehicle to the running cable | [1995/51] | French: | Pince à double effet pour connecter un véhicule à un câble tracteur | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 30.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/06] | DE | 30.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE161554 (W. DUSEDAU) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1131718 (POHLIG J AG); | [A]FR2656579 (TRANSPORT ETUDES [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 20; figure - *; | [AD]EP0461098 (DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 41 - line 53; figures 8,9 * | by applicant | EP0461098 |