EP0688505 - Behenic-rich triglycerides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1995/52] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cain, Frederick William Dr. Blookerstraat 12 NL-2271 VL Voorburg / NL | 02 /
Moore, Stephen Raymond 2 Wainwright Avenue Thrapston, Northamptonshire, NN14 4UH / GB | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Zweep, Robert-Jan, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Zweep, Robert-Jan, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201600.4 | 15.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | EP19940304631 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: EP 94304631 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688505 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23D9/00, C11C1/04, C11C3/08 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
C12Y301/01003 (EP);
A23D7/001 (EP);
A23D9/00 (EP);
C11C1/045 (EP);
C11C3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Behen-reiche Triglyceridöle | [1995/52] | English: | Behenic-rich triglycerides | [1995/52] | French: | Triglycérides riches en acide behenique | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0422490 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY) [X] 1,10 * page 20 - page 22; claims 1,2,5,6,8 * * page 5 - page 8 * [A] 3-5,7-9,11; | [X]EP0563593 (KAO CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 5, paragraph 1; example 1; claims 1,2; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US4883684 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY) [A] 1,2,4,9,10 * claims 1,2,4-7 *; | [A]JP60053598 ; | [Y]EP0126416 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [Y] 11,14,15 * page 16 - page 17; figure 4; claims 1,5-10 *; | [A]JPS6485040 ; | [A]EP0427309 (UNILEVER NV) [A] 1,2,10,11,13-15 * example .; claims 1-6,8,9 *; | [A]JPH03172151 | [Y] - "PLASTIC OIL AND FAT MATERIALS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19851223), vol. 103, no. 25, Database accession no. 213793 [Y] 11,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - JP-A-60053598 (KAO CORP.), & JP60053598 A 00000000 [A] 1,5-7 | [A] - P.E. SONNET ET AL, "FATTY ACID SELECTIVITY OF LIPASES: ERUCIC ACID FROM RAPESEED OIL", JAOCS, CHAMPAIGN USA, vol. 70, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02552712, pages 387 - 391, XP000360869 [A] 11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02552712 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900705), vol. 013, no. 290, Database accession no. (C - 614), & JP01085040 A 19890330 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 36, Database accession no. 91-263093, & JPH03172151 A 19910725 (FUJI OIL KK) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * | by applicant | - MC NEILL, SONNET, ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEM. SOC., (1994), page 550 * Annual Meeting abstracts * |