EP0688871 - Preparation of phytosphingosine derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 NL-1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casey, John 2 Manor Gardens, Stanwick Wellingborough NN9 2PL / GB | 02 /
Maume, Katherine A. 17 Crawley Hill Camberly GU15 2DA / GB | 03 /
Peters, Alfons L.J. J.H. van 't Hoffweg 24 NL-1402 VK Bussum / NL | 04 /
Veloo, Rudolf M. Van Tienhovenstraat 24 NL-1412 EC Naarden / NL | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Graham, John George, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Graham, John George, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1995/52] | Dekker, Enno E.J., et al Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201601.2 | 15.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | EP19940201825 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: EP 94201825 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0688871 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0688871 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/00, C12N1/14, C12R1/84, // (C12N1/14, C12R1:84) | [1998/25] | CPC: |
C12P13/001 (EP,US);
C12N1/165 (EP,US);
C12R2001/84 (EP,US);
Y10S435/938 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/52] | C12P13/00, C12N1/14, // (C12N1/14, C12R1:84) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Phytosphingosin-Derivaten | [1995/52] | English: | Preparation of phytosphingosine derivative | [1995/52] | French: | Préparation de dérivés de la phytosphingosine | [1995/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9410131 (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [X] 10,11,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-9,16; | [A]US4439525 (SHAY LUCAS K [US], et al) [A] 1-5,14-16 *See "mutagenesis" section*; | [PX]WO9512683 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [PX] 13-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - AUSUBEL F.M. ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, 1987, WILEY & SONS, N.Y., (1990), 167280, XP002061865 [Y] 1-9,16 * page 13.3.1 - page 13.3.2 * | [DA] - BARENHOLZ ET AL., "Identification of the enzymatic lesions responsible for the accumulation of acetylated sphingosine bases in the yeast Hansenula ciferrii", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1973), vol. 306, no. 2, pages 341 - 345, XP002061864 | by applicant | EP0097059 | GB2178312 | GB2213723 | EP0420722 | EP0500437 | - L.J. WICKERHAM AND F.H. STODOLA, J. BACTERIOL., (1960), vol. 80, pages 484 - 491 | - H.G. MAISTER ET AL., APPL. MICORBIOL., (1962), vol. 10, pages 401 - 406 | - M.L. GREENE ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1965), vol. 143, pages 553 - 565 | - R. KULMACS, G. SCHROEPFER, BIOCHEM. & BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1978), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 371 - 377 | - Y. BARENHOLTZ ET AL., BIOCHIM. & BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1971), vol. 248, pages 458 - 465 | - Y. BARENHOLTZ ET AL., BIOCHIM. & BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1973), vol. 306, pages 341 - 345 |