EP0751472 - Optical scanner for producing scanning lines in two perpendicular directions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTICON SENSORS EUROPE B.V. Kruisweg 825 2132 NG Hoofddorp / NL | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peng, Ke-Ou Stille Putten 82 2612 KV Delft / NL | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95201730.9 | 26.06.1995 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751472 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
G06K7/10693 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/14] |
Former [1997/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optischer Abtaster zur Erzeugung von senkrechten Abtastzeilen | [1997/01] | English: | Optical scanner for producing scanning lines in two perpendicular directions | [1997/01] | French: | Dispositif de balayage optique pour générer des lignes de balayage perpendiculaires | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 10.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 06.01.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/26] | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0490604 (NCR CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 5; figures 4,5 * [A] 10-13 [Y] 4-7,9; | [Y]EP0424096 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * abstract *; | [YA]EP0612034 (HALTON SYSTEM OY [FI]) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 12,13; | [Y]GB2255650 (SPECTRA PHYSICS SCANNING SYST [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0456095 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 9 * figure 3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US4097729 (SELIGMAN LAWRENCE, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 4; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | GB2255650 | EP19930202734 |