EP0694815 - Method of processing photographic colour silver halide materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1996/05] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fyson, John Richard Kodak Ltd., Patent Dept., Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1996/05] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95202058.4 | 27.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | GB19940015429 | 30.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9415429 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694815 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694815 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G03D13/007 (EP,US);
G03D3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsverfahren für farbphotographische Silberhalogenidmaterialien | [1996/05] | English: | Method of processing photographic colour silver halide materials | [1996/05] | French: | Procédé de traitement de matériaux photographiques couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4994837 (SAMUELS JAMES T [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,8 * |