EP0758822 - Method and arrangement for dynamic allocation of bandwidth in a TDM/TDMA network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2005/48] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states ALCATEL BELL Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen 1 / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sierens, Christiaan Hendrik Jozef Vijf Aprilwarande 11 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Vandenabeele, Peter Michel Noel K. Cardijnstraat 27 B-2500 Lier / BE | 03 /
Van Wonterghem, Geert Arthur Edith Stationsstraat 18 B-9900 Eeklo / BE | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 95202191.3 | 11.08.1995 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758822 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758822 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04J3/1694 (EP,US);
H04L2012/561 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5672 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur dynamischen Bandbreitenzuordnung in einem TDM/TDMA-Übertragungssystem | [1997/08] | English: | Method and arrangement for dynamic allocation of bandwidth in a TDM/TDMA network | [1997/08] | French: | Méthode et circuit pour l'allocation dynamique de bande passante dans un système de communication TDM-AMRT | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | ES | 12.06.2006 | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/45] | NL | 01.03.2006 | |
SE | 01.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4949395 (RYDBECK NILS R C [SE]) [Y] 9,10 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 33 * * column 6, line 35 - line 58 *; | [Y]EP0493287 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * column 6, line 24 - column 10, line 39 *; | [Y]DE4233581 (KRONE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,11-18* column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 9 *; | [Y]EP0621708 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-6,9-18 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 49 - line 53 * * page 6, line 1 - line 56 * * page 7, line 5 - line 17 * | [YA] - MOLLENAUER J F ET AL, "Cable-TV protocols for metropolitan and regional communication systems", INTEROPERABILITY IN BROADBAND NETWORKS, PROCEEDINGS OF INTERWORKING 94 - 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INTERWORKING, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE, 4-6 MAY 1994, 1994, AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, IOS PRESS, NETHERLANDS, pages 238 - 249 [Y] 6 * page 241, paragraph 3.4 * * page 243, line 1 - line 7 * * page 244, paragraph 4.4 * * page 246, paragraph 6 * * page 248, line 7 - line 17 * [A] 1-5,7-18 | Examination | - VANDENABEELE P.; SIERENS C., "ATM-based Hybrid Fiber Coax System", IEEE 802.14 CONTRIBUTION, DALLAS, (199505), pages 1 - 18 |