EP0699452 - Locking safety needle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/10] | Long safety needle assembly | ||
[1999/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graves, Arlinda 49A Willowbrook Avenue Stamford, CT 06902 / US | 02 /
Sweeney, Niall 238 Union Avenue Rutherford, NJ 07070 / US | 03 /
Szabo, Sandor 23 Florence Place Elmwood Park, NJ 07407 / US | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1996/10] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95202234.1 | 18.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | US19940297347 | 29.08.1994 Original published format: US 297347 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0699452 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0699452 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699452 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/04, A61M39/10 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
A61M39/1011 (EP,US);
A61M39/14 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1044 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1066 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1072 (EP,US);
A61M39/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/10] | A61M39/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verriegelbare Sicherheitsnadelanordnung | [1999/03] | English: | Locking safety needle assembly | [1999/03] | French: | Ensemble aiguille de sécurité verrouillable | [1999/03] |
Former [1996/10] | Lange Sicherheitsnadelanordnung | ||
Former [1996/10] | Long safety needle assembly | ||
Former [1996/10] | Ensemble aiguille de sécurité long | Examination procedure | 10.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0604743 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * column W *; | [A]EP0169704 (WALLACE HENRY GEORGE) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 33 - line 45; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4752292 (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 8, line 9 - column 11, line 58; figures 7-22 * | by applicant | USRE33617E | US4790829 |