EP0700821 - Selective compound steering mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon Essex SS14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurlburt, Joseph C. 1829 Wilson Avenue Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 95202315.8 | 28.08.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19940302450 | 09.09.1994 Original published format: US 302450 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700821 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700821 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/06, B62D9/00 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
B62D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/11] | Title | German: | Kombinierte Lenkung mit wählbarer Lenkübersetzung | [1996/11] | English: | Selective compound steering mechanism | [1996/11] | French: | Mécanisme de direction combiné à sélection du rapport de braquage | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US5297648 (HANSEN CHARLES A [US], et al) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [DXA]US5312123 (HURLBURT JOSEPH C [US]) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [A]DE1991877U (FENDT) [A] 1,2,5,9,11,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3064993 (TANGJERD MAURICE F) [A] 1,2,5,9,11,14 * column W * | by applicant | US5312124 | US5297648 | US5312123 | US5219180 |