EP0765107 - circuit arrangement for avoiding striations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arts, Paulus Petrus Bernardus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Beij, Marcel c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Buij, Arnold Willem c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/13] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95202578.1 | 25.09.1995 | [1997/13] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765107 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765107 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/295 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H05B41/3925 (EP,US);
H05B41/2858 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Vorkommen von Streifen | [1997/13] | English: | circuit arrangement for avoiding striations | [1997/13] | French: | Circuit pour éviter les stries | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2246034 (LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 16, line 12 - page 16, line 24 * * page 17, line 12 - page 18, line 24; figures 6,8,9 *; | [Y]US5001386 (SULLIVAN CHARLES R [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 29 * * column 6, line 17 - column 6, line 31; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9209183 (NEON DYNAMICS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 22 - page 16, line 13; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0547674 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]WO8808241 (HERRICK KENNAN C [US]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2119184 | US4682082 |