EP0706755 - A device and a method for mixing fodder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trioliet Mullos B.V. Smitsbreeweg 2-6 7581 HE Losser / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Trioliet Mullos B.V. Smitsbreeweg 2-6 NL-7581 HE Losser / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Plas, Nicolaas De Kalder 8 NL-7576 WB Oldenzaal / NL | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/16] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Trenité Van Doorne De Lairessestraat 133 NL-1075 HJ Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 95202641.7 | 02.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | NL19940001662 | 10.10.1994 Original published format: NL 9401662 | [1996/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706755 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706755 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/00 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A01K5/004 (EP);
B01F35/7547 (EP,US);
B01F27/80 (EP);
B01F33/502 (EP);
B01F33/5023 (EP);
B01F35/71 (EP);
B01F35/71765 (EP,US);
B01F35/7178 (EP);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Mischen von Futter | [1996/16] | English: | A device and a method for mixing fodder | [1996/16] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour mélanger du fourrage | [1996/16] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1999/14: (deleted) | EPB 1999/14: (deleted) | EPB 1999/14: (deleted) | EPB 1997/18: Teilanmeldung 97200326.3 eingereicht am 06/02/97 | EPB 1997/18: Divisional application 97200326.3 filed on 06/02/97 | EPB 1997/18: Demande divisionnaire 97200326.3 déposée le 06/02/97 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 15.09.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.1998 | Observations by third parties | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP97200326.3 / EP0779027 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.2000
WITHDRAWN KUHN-AUDUREAU S.A. Rue Quinquèse 85260 La Copechagnière / FR Opponent's representative Andres, Jean-Claude KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques BP 60 67706 Saverne Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.2000
WITHDRAWN KUHN-AUDUREAU S.A. Rue Quinquèse 85260 La Copechagnière / FR Opponent's representative Andres, Jean-Claude KUHN S.A., 4, Impasse des Fabriques, BP 60 67706 Saverne Cedex / FR | 08.02.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 28.07.2000 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2726203 (TEBBE GMBH & CO KG ALBERT) [A] 1-4,7-11 * page 10, paragraph L - page 16 *; | [A]EP0003813 (LENGERICH BERNARD VAN [DE]) [A] 1,2,11 * page 5 - page 8; figure - *; | [A]US4432499 (HENKENSIEFKEN LARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * column 2, line 19 - column 5, line 64; figure - *; | [A]EP0432702 (FACCIA TIZIANO [IT]) [A] 1,11 * column W *; | [A]EP0506158 (TRIOLIET MULLOS [NL]) [A] 1,3-8* column W *; | [A]EP0540130 (LITECH BV [NL]) [A] 1-4,7,11 * column 1, line 54 - column 7, line 45; figure - * | by applicant | EP19950202641 | other | - "AGM AGRI MIX.", AGM AGRI MIX, XX, XX, XX, (19980101), pages 01 - 04., XP000667260 | - "EEN MODERN EN VEELZIJDIG MECHANISATIEBEDRIJF.", LANDBOUWMECHANISATIE., AGRIMEDIA B.V., WAGENINGEN., NL, NL, (19951001), ISSN 0023-7795, pages 01 - 04., XP000667261 |