EP0700108 - Method of making membrane-electrode assemblies for electrochemical cells and assemblies made thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swathirajan, Sundarajan 4637 Fairmont Drive Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | 02 /
Mikhail, Youssef Mocos 12702 Windsor Drive Sterling Heights, Michigan 48313 / US | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95202766.2 | 10.03.1993 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | US19920862691 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: US 862691 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0700108 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0700108 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
H01M4/96 (EP,US);
C25B9/23 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Membran-Elektrode-Anordnungen für elektrochemische Zellen und so hergestellte Anordnungen | [1996/10] | English: | Method of making membrane-electrode assemblies for electrochemical cells and assemblies made thereby | [1996/10] | French: | Méthode de fabrication diassemblages membrane-électrode et assemblages ainsi fabriqués | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/22] | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93200685.1 / EP0569062 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9215121 (US ENERGY [US]) [PX] 1-5 * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 12 * * page 8, line 14 - line 19 * * page 9, line 5 - line 6; claims 1,16 *; | JPS61295388 [ ] (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]EP0226911 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 14 * page 5, line 29 - line 38 *; | [A]AT389020B (SCHUETZ PETER DIPL ING DR) [A] 14 * claims 14,18 *; | [A]US4804592 (VANDERBORGH NICHOLAS E [US], et al); | [A]US4272353 (LAWRANCE RICHARD J, et al) | [Y] - M. S. WILSON ET AL, "Thin -film catalyst layers for polymer electrolyte fuel cell electrodes", JOURNAL OF APPLIED ELECTROCHEMISTRY, LONDON GB, vol. 22, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/BF01093004, pages 1 - 7, XP000461070 [Y] 1-5 * page 2, column R, paragraph L - page 3, column R, paragraph 2 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01093004 | [Y] - M. S. WILSON ET AL, "RECENT ACHIEVEMENTS IN POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL (PEFC) RESEARCH AT LOS ALAMOS NATIONAL LABORATORY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH INTERSOCIETY ENERGY CONVERSION ENGINEERING CONFERENCE IECEC-91, 4-9 AUGUST BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, vol. 3, pages 636 - 641, XP000299777 [Y] 1-5 * page 636, column R, line 16 - line 25 * * page 636, column R, line 36 - page 637, column L, line 1 * | [A] - FUJITA YUKO ET AL, "Manufacture of ion exchange membrane-electrode connection", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870921), vol. 107, no. 12, Database accession no. 104995x [A] 14,15 * abstract * |